+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On September 1, 2021 in the House:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref to the Com on Insurance, if favorable, Local Government - Land Use, Planning and Development, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On May 6, 2021 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On May 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Sent To House
On May 5, 2021 in the House:
- Regular Message Received From Senate
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed On Cal For 05/04/2021
- Reptd Fav
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Vote
May 4, 2021: Second Reading
- Yeas: 49
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor