+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (27)
On July 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ch. SL 2013-301
- Signed by Gov. 7/18/2013
On July 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Pres. To Gov. 07/12/2013
- Ratified
On July 10, 2013 in the House:
- Ordered Enrolled
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On July 9, 2013 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 07/10/2013
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Withdrawn From Com
On May 30, 2013 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Appropriations
- Reptd Fav
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref to the Com on Judiciary Subcommittee C, if favorable, Appropriations
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Rec From Senate
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Engrossed
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Amend Adopted A1
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed On Cal For 05/13/2013
- Withdrawn From Com
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Appropriations/Base Budget
- Withdrawn From Cal
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Judiciary II
- Passed 1st Reading
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (3)
July 10, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 108
- Present/NV: 4
- Absent: 7
May 13, 2013: Amendment 1
- Yeas: 44
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 1
May 13, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 48
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 1