+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sequential Referral To Rules and Operations of the Senate Added
- Sequential Referral To Appropriations/Base Budget Added
- Sequential Referral To Rules and Operations of the Senate Stricken
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Withdrawn From Com
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor