+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Special Message Sent To House
On May 12, 2021 in the House:
- Special Message Received From Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On May 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
On May 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Vote
May 12, 2021: Second Reading
- Yeas: 46
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor