+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (30)
On May 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ch. SL 2015-36
- Signed by Gov. 5/26/2015
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Pres. To Gov. 05/19/2015
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ratified
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered Enrolled
- Concurred In H/Com Sub
On May 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed On Cal For 05/14/2015
- Regular Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub
On May 13, 2015 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On May 7, 2015 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 05/12/2015
- Withdrawn From Com
On May 6, 2015 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Judiciary II
- Passed 1st Reading
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Regular Message Received From Senate
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Sent To House
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Engrossed
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Amend Adopted A1
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On April 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Judiciary II
- Withdrawn From Com
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Votes (4)
May 14, 2015: Motion 9 To Concur
- Yeas: 48
- Absent: 2
May 12, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 119
- Absent: 1
April 20, 2015: Amendment 1
- Yeas: 49
- Absent: 1
April 20, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 49
- Absent: 1