+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ch. SL 2013-20
- Signed by Gov. 4/3/2013
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Pres. To Gov. 04/01/2013
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ratified
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Ordered Enrolled
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Postponed To 03/27/2013
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 03/26/2013
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Judiciary Subcommittee A
- Passed 1st Reading
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Rec From Senate
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Commerce
- Passed 1st Reading
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (2)
March 27, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 118
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 1
February 27, 2013: SECOND READING
- Yeas: 46
- Absent: 4