+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (25)
On June 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ch. SL 2013-157
- Signed by Gov. 6/19/2013
On June 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Pres. To Gov. 06/14/2013
- Ratified
On June 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered Enrolled
- Concurred In H/Com Sub
On June 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed On Cal For 06/12/2013
- Rec To Concur H Com Sub
On June 10, 2013 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On June 6, 2013 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 06/07/2013
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Judiciary Subcommittee C
- Passed 1st Reading
- Rec From Senate
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Engrossed
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Amend Adopted A1
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Judiciary I
- Passed 1st Reading
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (160)
- 66 -
- 87 -
- 105-114.1 -
- 105-122.1 -
- 105-130.2 -
- 105-134.1 -
- 105-163.1 -
- 117-18.1 -
- 25-9-406 -
- 25-9-408 -
- 55-1-40 -
- 55A-1-40 -
- 55A-11-02 -
- 55D-1 -
- 55D-10 -
- 55D-13 -
- 55D-15 -
- 55D-17 -
- 55D-20 -
- 55D-21 -
- 55D-22 -
- 55D-31 -
- 57-10-01 -
- 57C-2-04 -
- 57C-7-23 -
- 57D-1-01 -
- 57D-1-02 -
- 57D-1-03 -
- 57D-1-04 -
- 57D-1-05 -
- 57D-1-06 -
- 57D-1-07 -
- 57D-1-09 -
- 57D-1-10 -
- 57D-1-12 -
- 57D-1-13 -
- 57D-1-14 -
- 57D-1-15 -
- 57D-1-16 -
- 57D-1-17 -
- 57D-1-18 -
- 57D-1-20 -
- 57D-1-21 -
- 57D-1-22 -
- 57D-1-23 -
- 57D-1-24 -
- 57D-1-25 -
- 57D-1-30 -
- 57D-1-31 -
- 57D-1-32 -
- 57D-1-33 -
- 57D-10-01 -
- 57D-10-02 -
- 57D-10-04 -
- 57D-11-01 -
- 57D-11-02 -
- 57D-11-03 -
- 57D-111 -
- 57D-2-01 -
- 57D-2-02 -
- 57D-2-03 -
- 57D-2-04 -
- 57D-2-20 -
- 57D-2-21 -
- 57D-2-22 -
- 57D-2-23 -
- 57D-2-24 -
- 57D-2-25 -
- 57D-2-30 -
- 57D-2-31 -
- 57D-2-32 -
- 57D-2-40 -
- 57D-2-41 -
- 57D-3-01 -
- 57D-3-02 -
- 57D-3-03 -
- 57D-3-04 -
- 57D-3-05 -
- 57D-3-20 -
- 57D-3-21 -
- 57D-3-22 -
- 57D-3-23 -
- 57D-3-30 -
- 57D-3-31 -
- 57D-4-01 -
- 57D-4-02 -
- 57D-4-03 -
- 57D-4-04 -
- 57D-4-05 -
- 57D-4-06 -
- 57D-4-07 -
- 57D-5-01 -
- 57D-5-02 -
- 57D-5-03 -
- 57D-5-04 -
- 57D-5-05 -
- 57D-6-01 -
- 57D-6-02 -
- 57D-6-03 -
- 57D-6-04 -
- 57D-6-05 -
- 57D-6-06 -
- 57D-6-07 -
- 57D-6-08 -
- 57D-6-09 -
- 57D-6-10 -
- 57D-6-11 -
- 57D-6-12 -
- 57D-6-13 -
- 57D-7-01 -
- 57D-7-02 -
- 57D-7-03 -
- 57D-7-04 -
- 57D-7-05 -
- 57D-7-06 -
- 57D-7-07 -
- 57D-7-20 -
- 57D-7-21 -
- 57D-7-22 -
- 57D-7-23 -
- 57D-7-30 -
- 57D-7-31 -
- 57D-7-32 -
- 57D-7-33 -
- 57D-8-01 -
- 57D-8-02 -
- 57D-8-03 -
- 57D-8-04 -
- 57D-8-05 -
- 57D-8-06 -
- 57D-8-07 -
- 57D-9-01 -
- 57D-9-02 -
- 57D-9-20 -
- 57D-9-21 -
- 57D-9-22 -
- 57D-9-23 -
- 57D-9-24 -
- 57D-9-30 -
- 57D-9-31 -
- 57D-9-32 -
- 57D-9-33 -
- 57D-9-34 -
- 57D-9-40 -
- 57D-9-41 -
- 57D-9-42 -
- 57D-9-43 -
- 57D-9-44 -
- 57D1-08 -
- 59-102 -
- 59-32 -
- 66-260 -
- 66-352 -
- 66-353 -
- 7D-8-03 -
- 87-10.1 -
- 87-22.2 -
- 87-44.2 -
- 89C-18.1 -
- 89F-6 -
+ − Votes (4)
June 12, 2013: Motion 9 To Concur
- Yeas: 49
- Absent: 1
June 10, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 111
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 6
April 25, 2013: Amendment 1
- Yeas: 45
- Absent: 5
April 25, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 45
- Absent: 5