+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (24)
On July 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by Gov. 7/8/2022
- Ch. SL 2022-57
On July 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Ratified
- Pres. To Gov. 7/1/2022
On June 30, 2022 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Added to Calendar
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Ordered Enrolled
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On April 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Sent To House
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Regular Message Received From Senate
On April 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
June 30, 2022: Second Reading
- Yeas: 112
- Absent: 8
April 26, 2021: Second Reading
- Yeas: 48
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor