+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (25)
On June 14, 2017 in the House:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On June 13, 2017 in the House:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref Com On Environment
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Sent To House
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Regular Message Received From Senate
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Engrossed
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Amend Adopted A1
- Placed On Cal For 04/24/2017
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On April 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Re-ref Com On Appropriations/Base Budget
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref to Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources. If fav, re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (18)
+ − Votes (2)
April 24, 2017: Amendment 1
- Yeas: 42
- Nays: 6
- Absent: 2
April 24, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 17
- Absent: 2