+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (36)
On August 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by Gov. 8/25/2014
- Ch. SL 2014-117
On August 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Pres. To Gov. 08/20/2014
- Ratified
- Ordered Enrolled
- Concurred In H/Com Sub
- Placed on Today's Calendar
- Withdrawn From Com
On July 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Withdrawn From Cal
On July 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed On Cal For 07/10/2014
- Special Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub
On July 3, 2014 in the House:
- Special Message Sent To Senate
On July 2, 2014 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref Com On Commerce and Job Development Subcommittee on Energy and Emerging Markets
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Added to Calendar
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On July 23, 2013 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Withdrawn From Com
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Education
- Withdrawn From Com
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Finance
- Passed 1st Reading
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Rec From Senate
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed On Cal For 03/04/2013
- Withdrawn From Cal
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On State and Local Government
- Passed 1st Reading
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (10)
- 115C -
- 160A -
- 115C-238.29F -
- 115C-238.29H -
- 160A-274 -
- 160A-280 -
- 96 -
- 132 -
- 132-1.1 -
- 96-4 -
+ − Votes (3)
August 20, 2014: Motion 9 To Concur
- Yeas: 40
- Absent: 10
July 2, 2014: Second Reading
- Yeas: 108
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 9
March 4, 2013: SECOND READING
- Yeas: 42
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 3