+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On June 30, 2016 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Withdrawn From Com
On June 23, 2016 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Finance
- Withdrawn From Com
- Serial Referral To Judiciary I Stricken
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Ref to the Com on State Personnel, if favorable, Judiciary I
- Passed 1st Reading
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Regular Message Received From Senate
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Sent To House
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Judiciary II
- Reptd Fav
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sequential Referral To Judiciary II Added
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On State and Local Government
- Withdrawn From Com
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Vote
April 27, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 50
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor