+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On June 21, 2017 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Re-ref Com On Appropriations
On June 8, 2017 in the House:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref to the Com on State and Local Government II, if favorable, Appropriations
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On April 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Sent To House
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- Regular Message Received From Senate
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Placed on Today's Calendar
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Reptd Fav
On April 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Statute Amended
- 143C-1-2 -
+ − Vote
April 11, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 42
- Absent: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor