+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (25)
On July 10, 2019 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Reptd Fav
On June 6, 2019 in the House:
- Re-ref to the Com on Homeland Security, Military, and Veterans Affairs, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Withdrawn From Com
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Passed 1st Reading
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Sent To House
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Regular Message Received From Senate
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Amend Adopted A1
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed On Cal For 04/17/2019
- Withdrawn From Cal
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed On Cal For 04/16/2019
- Withdrawn From Cal
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Withdrawn From Com
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
April 17, 2019: Amendment 1
- Yeas: 43
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 6
April 17, 2019: Second Reading
- Yeas: 43
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 6