+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (12)
+ − Actions (39)
On July 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ch. SL 2019-110
- Signed by Gov. 7/11/2019
On July 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Pres. To Gov. 7/1/2019
On June 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ratified
On June 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered Enrolled
- Concurred In H Com Sub
On June 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Special Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub
On June 25, 2019 in the House:
- Special Message Sent To Senate
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On June 24, 2019 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 06/25/2019
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav
On June 18, 2019 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On June 17, 2019 in the House:
- Re-ref to the Com on Pensions and Retirement, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Withdrawn From Com
On June 12, 2019 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Reptd Fav
On June 10, 2019 in the House:
- Re-ref to the Com on Education - K-12, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Withdrawn From Com
On May 9, 2019 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Passed 1st Reading
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Special Message Sent To House
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- Special Message Received From Senate
On May 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
On May 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Pensions and Retirement and Aging
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Pensions and Retirement and Aging. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Withdrawn From Com
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
June 27, 2019: Motion 9 To Concur
- Yeas: 47
- Absent: 3
June 25, 2019: Second Reading
- Yeas: 108
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 7
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor