+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 9, 2019 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Sent To House
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- Regular Message Received From Senate
On May 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On May 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref to Pensions and Retirement and Aging. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Vote
May 7, 2019: Second Reading
- Yeas: 47
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor