+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (31)
On July 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Gov. 7/20/2017
- Ch. SL 2017-147
On June 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ratified
- Pres. To Gov. 6/27/2017
On June 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Concurred In H/Com Sub
- Ordered Enrolled
On June 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub
- Placed On Cal For 06/26/2017
On June 22, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On June 21, 2017 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 06/22/2017
On June 13, 2017 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Judiciary I
- Withdrawn From Com
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Sent To House
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Regular Message Received From Senate
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On April 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
- Placed On Cal For 04/24/2017
On April 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (3)
June 26, 2017: Motion 9 To Concur
- Yeas: 47
- Absent: 3
June 22, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 111
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 8
April 24, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 48
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor