+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (36)
On June 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ch. SL 2016-58
- Signed by Gov. 6/30/2016
On June 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Pres. To Gov. 06/22/2016
On June 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ratified
On June 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered Enrolled
- Concurred In H/Com Sub
On June 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed On Cal For 06/20/2016
- Regular Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub
On June 16, 2016 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On June 15, 2016 in the House:
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Added to Calendar
On August 10, 2015 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Local Government
- Withdrawn From Com
On July 15, 2015 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Regulatory Reform
- Withdrawn From Com
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Sent To House
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Regular Message Received From Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Engrossed
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Amend Adopted A1
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Finance
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Education/Higher Education
- Withdrawn From Com
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (4)
June 20, 2016: Motion 9 To Concur
- Yeas: 47
- Absent: 3
June 15, 2016: Second Reading
- Yeas: 116
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 3
April 29, 2015: Amendment 1
- Yeas: 50
April 29, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 50
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor