+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (51)
On June 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Gov. 6/28/2017
- Ch. SL 2017-69
On June 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Pres. To Gov. 6/22/2017
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ratified
On June 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conf Report Adopted 3rd
- Ordered Enrolled
On June 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conf Report Passed 2nd
On June 19, 2017 in the House:
- Conf Report Adopted
On June 15, 2017 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 06/19/2017
- Conf Com Reported
On June 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed On Cal For 06/19/2017
- Conf Held As Material
- Conf Com Reported
On June 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conf Com Appointed
On June 12, 2017 in the House:
- Conf Com Appointed
On June 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Failed Concur In H Com Sub
On June 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub
- Placed On Cal For 06/06/2017
On June 2, 2017 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On June 1, 2017 in the House:
- Amend Adopted A1
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Ordered Engrossed
On May 30, 2017 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 06/01/2017
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Placed On Cal For 05/30/2017
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Withdrawn From Com
On May 26, 2017 in the House:
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
On May 22, 2017 in the House:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref Com On Finance
On May 15, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On May 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Sent To House
On May 11, 2017 in the House:
- Regular Message Received From Senate
On May 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On May 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
- Re-ref Com On Finance
On April 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref to Transportation. If fav, re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (9)
+ − Votes (8)
June 20, 2017: Conference Rpt For Adoption Third Reading
- Yeas: 48
- Absent: 1
June 19, 2017: Conference Rpt For Adoption Second Reading
- Yeas: 47
- Absent: 2
June 19, 2017: C RPT Adoption
- Yeas: 116
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 2
June 6, 2017: For Concurrence Second Reading
- Nays: 47
- Absent: 2
June 1, 2017: A1 Rogers Third Reading
- Yeas: 115
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 3
June 1, 2017: Third Reading
- Yeas: 116
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 3
May 30, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 110
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 8
May 11, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 47
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor