+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (24)
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ch. SL 2015-64
- Signed by Gov. 6/11/2015
On June 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Pres. To Gov. 06/05/2015
On June 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ratified
On June 3, 2015 in the House:
- Ordered Enrolled
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On June 2, 2015 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 06/03/2015
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Serial Referral To Local Government Stricken
- Reptd Fav
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref to the Com on Education - K-12, if favorable, Local Government
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- Regular Message Received From Senate
On April 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Sent To House
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Education/Higher Education
- Withdrawn From Com
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (2)
June 3, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 116
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 3
April 2, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 44
- Absent: 6