+ − Summaries (27)
+ − Full Texts (52)
+ − Actions (81)
On June 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Ch. SL 2020-18
- Signed by Gov. 6/12/2020
On June 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Pres. To Gov. 6/9/2020
On June 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Ratified
On June 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Ordered Enrolled
- Conf Report #2 Adopted
On June 3, 2020 in the House:
- Conf Report #2 Adopted
- Added to Calendar
- Conf Com Reported
On June 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed On Cal For 06/04/2020
- Conf Com #2 Reported
On May 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Conf Rpt Recon/withdrawn
On October 29, 2019 in the House:
- Conf Rpt Withdrawn
- Withdrawn From Cal
On October 28, 2019 in the House:
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Withdrawn From Cal
On October 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conf Report Adopted
On October 24, 2019 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 10/28/2019
- Cal Pursuant Rule 44(d)
On October 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed On Cal For 10/28/2019
- Conf Com Reported
On October 24, 2019 in the House:
- Conf Com Reported
On October 8, 2019 in the House:
- Conferees Changed
On October 7, 2019 in the House:
- Conf Com Appointed
On October 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conf Com Appointed
On October 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Failed Concur In H Com Sub
- Placed on Today's Calendar
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref Com On Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources
- Withdrawn From Com
On August 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Special Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub
On August 21, 2019 in the House:
- Special Message Sent To Senate
- Ordered Engrossed
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Amend Failed A7
- Amend Failed A6
- Amend Adopted A5
- Amend Adopted A4
- Amend Adopted A3
- Amend Failed A2
- Amend Adopted A1
On August 20, 2019 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 08/21/2019
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav Com Sub 4
On July 25, 2019 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Reptd Fav Com Sub 3
On July 17, 2019 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Judiciary
- Reptd Fav Com Sub 2
On July 1, 2019 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Finance
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On June 19, 2019 in the House:
- Ref to the Com on Agriculture, if favorable, Finance, if favorable, Judiciary, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Passed 1st Reading
On June 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Sent To House
On June 18, 2019 in the House:
- Regular Message Received From Senate
On June 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Amend Failed A3
- Amend Tabled A2
- Motion to Divide Question Failed
- Amend Adopted A1
On June 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed On Cal For 06/17/2019
- Reptd Fav
On June 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On June 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Finance
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On June 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Withdrawn From Com
On June 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Finance
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-ref to Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources. If fav, re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Withdrawn From Com
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (10)
+ − Votes (2)
June 4, 2020: Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt
- Yeas: 39
- Nays: 9
- Absent: 2
June 3, 2020: C RPT Adoption
- Yeas: 86
- Nays: 34
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor