+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (28)
On July 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ch. SL 2019-79
- Signed by Gov. 7/4/2019
On June 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Pres. To Gov. 6/27/2019
- Ratified
On June 26, 2019 in the House:
- Ordered Enrolled
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On June 25, 2019 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 06/26/2019
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav
On June 20, 2019 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Reptd Fav
On June 13, 2019 in the House:
- Re-ref to the Com on Regulatory Reform, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Withdrawn From Com
On May 9, 2019 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Passed 1st Reading
On May 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Sent To House
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- Regular Message Received From Senate
On May 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
On May 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Reptd Fav
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Withdrawn From Com
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
June 26, 2019: Second Reading
- Yeas: 114
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 3
May 6, 2019: Second Reading
- Yeas: 48
- Absent: 2