+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (31)
On May 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ch. SL 2019-17
- Signed by Gov. 5/30/2019
On May 28, 2019 in the House:
- Ordered Enrolled
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On May 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Pres. To Gov. 5/28/2019
- Ratified
On May 22, 2019 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 05/28/2019
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Reptd Fav
On May 20, 2019 in the House:
- Re-ref to the Com on Energy and Public Utilities, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Withdrawn From Com
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Passed 1st Reading
On May 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Sent To House
On May 6, 2019 in the House:
- Regular Message Received From Senate
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On May 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Reptd Fav
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Judiciary
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Withdrawn From Com
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
May 28, 2019: Second Reading
- Yeas: 114
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 5
May 2, 2019: Second Reading
- Yeas: 49
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (42)
Type:
Primary Sponsor