+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (30)
On June 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ch. SL 2015-106
- Signed by Gov. 6/24/2015
On June 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Pres. To Gov. 06/17/2015
On June 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ratified
On June 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered Enrolled
- Concurred In H/Com Sub
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed On Cal For 06/15/2015
- Regular Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub
On June 11, 2015 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On June 10, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Added to Calendar
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Re-ref Com On Judiciary I
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Ref to the Com on Transportation, if favorable, Judiciary I
- Passed 1st Reading
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Regular Message Received From Senate
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Sent To House
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Judiciary I
- Reptd Fav
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-ref to Transportation. If fav, re-ref to Judiciary I
- Withdrawn From Com
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (3)
June 15, 2015: Motion 9 To Concur
- Yeas: 47
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 1
June 10, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 113
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 5
April 27, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 48
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor