+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (30)
On July 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ch. SL 2019-145
- Signed by Gov. 7/19/2019
On July 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Pres. To Gov. 7/11/2019
On July 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ratified
On July 9, 2019 in the House:
- Ordered Enrolled
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On July 8, 2019 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 07/09/2019
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav
On June 27, 2019 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Reptd Fav
On May 30, 2019 in the House:
- Re-ref to the Com on Health, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Withdrawn From Com
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Passed 1st Reading
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Sent To House
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Regular Message Received From Senate
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed On Cal For 04/02/2019
- Reptd Fav
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-ref to Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Withdrawn From Com
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
July 9, 2019: Second Reading
- Yeas: 113
- Present/NV: 4
- Absent: 3
April 2, 2019: Second Reading
- Yeas: 46
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor