+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (19)
+ − Actions (43)
On July 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ch. SL 2019-182
- Signed by Gov. 7/29/2019
On July 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Pres. To Gov. 7/19/2019
On July 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ratified
On July 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered Enrolled
- Concurred In H Com Sub
On July 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub
On July 12, 2019 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On July 11, 2019 in the House:
- Ordered Engrossed
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Amend Failed A3
- Amend Failed A2
- Amend Adopted A1
On July 10, 2019 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Added to Calendar
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav Com Sub 2
On June 27, 2019 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On June 26, 2019 in the House:
- Re-ref to the Com on Alcoholic Beverage Control, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Withdrawn From Com
On June 25, 2019 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Special Message Received From Senate
On June 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Special Message Sent To House
- Engrossed
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Amend Adopted A1
On June 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed On Cal For 06/25/2019
- Withdrawn From Cal
On June 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed On Cal For 06/24/2019
- Reptd Fav
On June 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Reptd Fav
On June 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Finance
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Withdrawn From Com
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (2)
July 16, 2019: Motion 9 To Concur
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 8
July 11, 2019: Third Reading
- Yeas: 86
- Nays: 28
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor