+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On April 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Insurance
- Withdrawn From Com
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Appropriations/Base Budget
- Reptd Fav
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget
- Withdrawn From Com
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed