+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (30)
On June 25, 2020 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Serial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Stricken
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Added to Calendar
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Ordered Enrolled
On June 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Ratified
- Ch. SL 2020-37
On June 17, 2020 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Re-ref Com On Finance
On May 21, 2019 in the House:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref to the Com on State and Local Government, if favorable, Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Sent To House
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Regular Message Received From Senate
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Re-ref Com On Finance
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor