+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (25)
On July 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by Gov. 7/18/2013
- Ch. SL 2013-297
On July 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Pres. To Gov. 07/10/2013
On July 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ratified
On July 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered Enrolled
- Concurred In H/Com Sub
On July 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed On Cal For 07/02/2013
- Rec To Concur H Com Sub
On June 27, 2013 in the House:
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Placed On Cal For 06/27/2013
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On June 7, 2013 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Finance
- Withdrawn From Com
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Homeland Security, Military, and Veterans Affairs
- Passed 1st Reading
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Rec From Senate
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Transportation
- Passed 1st Reading
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (6)
+ − Votes (3)
July 2, 2013: Motion 9 To Concur
- Yeas: 44
- Absent: 6
June 27, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 101
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 15
March 28, 2013: SECOND READING
- Yeas: 49
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor