+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 27, 2015 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Judiciary II
- Reptd Fav
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Judiciary III
- Passed 1st Reading
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Regular Message Received From Senate
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Sent To House
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed On Cal For 04/14/2015
- Reptd Fav
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Judiciary I
- Withdrawn From Com
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Vote
April 14, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 49
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor