+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (37)
On July 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by Gov. 7/7/2022
- Ch. SL 2022-53
On July 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Ratified
- Pres. To Gov. 7/1/2022
On June 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Concurred In H Com Sub
- Ordered Enrolled
On June 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Placed On Cal For 06/30/2022
On June 28, 2022 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On June 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Special Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub
On June 28, 2022 in the House:
- Special Message Sent To Senate
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Added to Calendar
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav
- Reptd Fav Com Sub 2
On June 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On June 14, 2022 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Re-ref Com On Finance
On March 11, 2022 in the House:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref to the Com on Local Government, if favorable, Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On May 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Special Message Sent To House
On May 13, 2021 in the House:
- Special Message Received From Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On May 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
On May 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
June 30, 2022: Motion 9 To Concur
- Yeas: 47
- Absent: 3
June 28, 2022: Second Reading
- Yeas: 111
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor