+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (20)
On June 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ch. SL 2013-90
- Signed by Gov. 6/12/2013
On June 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Pres. To Gov. 06/06/2013
On June 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ratified
On June 4, 2013 in the House:
- Ordered Enrolled
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On June 3, 2013 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 06/04/2013
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Judiciary Subcommittee B
- Passed 1st Reading
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Rec From Senate
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Judiciary II
- Passed 1st Reading
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (2)
June 4, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 115
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 3
May 8, 2013: SECOND READING
- Yeas: 49
- Absent: 1