+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On September 27, 2019 in the House:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref Com On Appropriations
On June 25, 2019 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On June 13, 2019 in the House:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref to the Com on Education - Universities, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Sent To House
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Regular Message Received From Senate
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Vote
March 28, 2019: Second Reading
- Yeas: 47
- Absent: 3