+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (27)
On June 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ratified
- Ch. SL 2019-30
On June 18, 2019 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Ordered Enrolled
On June 17, 2019 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 06/18/2019
On June 12, 2019 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On May 21, 2019 in the House:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref to the Com on State and Local Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Passed 1st Reading
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Sent To House
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Regular Message Received From Senate
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor