+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (20)
On June 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ch. SL 2013-63
- Signed by Gov. 6/4/2013
On May 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Pres. To Gov. 05/31/2013
- Ratified
On May 29, 2013 in the House:
- Ordered Enrolled
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On May 28, 2013 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 05/29/2013
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Environment
- Passed 1st Reading
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Rec From Senate
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources
- Passed 1st Reading
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (5)
- 113 -
- 113-270.1A -
- 113-270.2A -
- 113-274 -
- 113-276 -
+ − Votes (2)
May 29, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 117
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 2
April 10, 2013: SECOND READING
- Yeas: 49
- Absent: 1