+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ch. SL 2013-34
- Signed by Gov. 4/24/2013
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Pres. To Gov. 04/16/2013
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ratified
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Ordered Enrolled
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 04/11/2013
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Judiciary Subcommittee A
- Passed 1st Reading
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Rec From Senate
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Commerce
- Passed 1st Reading
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
+ − Votes (2)
April 11, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 107
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 10
March 27, 2013: SECOND READING
- Yeas: 49
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor