+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (36)
On June 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ch. SL 2013-152
- Signed by Gov. 6/19/2013
On June 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Pres. To Gov. 06/14/2013
- Ratified
On June 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered Enrolled
- Concurred In H Amend S222v2
On June 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed On Cal For 06/12/2013
- Withdrawn From Cal
On June 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed On Cal For 06/11/2013
- Withdrawn From Cal
On June 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed On Cal For 06/06/2013
- Rec To Concur In H Amend
On June 4, 2013 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Amend Adopted A2
- Amend Adopted A1
On June 3, 2013 in the House:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 06/04/2013
On May 30, 2013 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Health and Human Services
- Reptd Fav
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Ref to the Com on Judiciary Subcommittee B, if favorable, Health and Human Services
- Passed 1st Reading
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Rec From Senate
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Placed On Cal For 04/16/2013
- Re-ref Com On Finance
- Withdrawn From Com
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-ref to Judiciary II. If fav, re-ref to Finance
- Withdrawn From Com
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Finance
- Passed 1st Reading
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (6)
+ − Votes (5)
June 12, 2013: Motion 9 To Concur
- Yeas: 49
- Absent: 1
June 4, 2013: A1 Horn Second Reading
- Yeas: 116
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 3
June 4, 2013: A2 Horn Second Reading
- Yeas: 115
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 3
June 4, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 115
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 3
April 16, 2013: SECOND READING
- Yeas: 48
- Absent: 2