+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (32)
On July 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ch. SL 2015-170
- Signed by Gov. 7/23/2015
- Pres. To Gov. 07/23/2015
On July 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ratified
On July 21, 2015 in the House:
- Ordered Enrolled
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Amend Failed A5
- Amend Tabled A4
On July 20, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Amend Failed A3
- Amend Failed A2
- Amend Failed A1
On July 16, 2015 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 07/20/2015
On July 15, 2015 in the House:
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav
On July 1, 2015 in the House:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref Com On Homeland Security, Military, and Veterans Affairs
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- Ref to the Com on Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House, if favorable, Homeland Security, Military, and Veterans Affairs
- Passed 1st Reading
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- Regular Message Received From Senate
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Sent To House
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Engrossed
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Amend Adopted A1
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On February 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Commerce
- Withdrawn From Com
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (6)
+ − Statutes Amended (10)
+ − Votes (10)
July 21, 2015: A4 Hall, L. M3 To Lay On The Table Third Reading
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 42
- Present/NV: 11
- Absent: 8
July 21, 2015: A5 Turner, B. Third Reading
- Yeas: 42
- Nays: 67
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 8
July 21, 2015: Motion to Table the Motion to Re-Ref Third Reading
- Yeas: 67
- Nays: 41
- Present/NV: 4
- Absent: 8
July 21, 2015: Third Reading
- Yeas: 70
- Nays: 39
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 8
July 20, 2015: A1 Glazier Second Reading
- Yeas: 45
- Nays: 60
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 14
July 20, 2015: A2 Floyd Second Reading
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 64
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 14
July 20, 2015: A3 Turner, B. Second Reading
- Yeas: 39
- Nays: 67
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 13
July 20, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 70
- Nays: 37
- Absent: 13
April 22, 2015: Amendment 1
- Yeas: 48
- Absent: 2
April 22, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 48
- Absent: 2