+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (33)
On June 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ratified
- Ch. SL 2017-51
On June 26, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Ordered Enrolled
On June 22, 2017 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Added to Calendar
- Passed 2nd Reading
On June 14, 2017 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Re-ref Com On Finance
On June 13, 2017 in the House:
- Serial Referral To Finance Added
On June 1, 2017 in the House:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref Com On State and Local Government I
On May 17, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On May 16, 2017 in the House:
- Regular Message Received From Senate
On May 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Sent To House
On May 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On May 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On May 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Withdrawn From Com
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (4)
June 26, 2017: Third Reading
- Yeas: 110
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 4
- Absent: 5
June 22, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 106
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 13
May 12, 2017: Third Reading
- Yeas: 48
- Absent: 2
May 11, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 48
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor