+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (22)
On June 24, 2020 in the House:
- Failed 2nd Reading
On June 23, 2020 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 06/24/2020
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Sent To House
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Regular Message Received From Senate
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Amend Adopted A1
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Engrossed
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Placed On Cal For 03/26/2019
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref to Transportation. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
June 24, 2020: Second Reading M4 Previous Question
- Yeas: 66
- Nays: 51
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 1
June 24, 2020: Second Reading
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 62
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 1