+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (23)
+ − Actions (58)
On July 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by Gov. 7/8/2022
- Ch. SL 2022-68
On July 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Conf Report #2 Adopted
On July 1, 2022 in the House:
- Conf Report #2 Adopted
On July 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Ordered Enrolled
- Ratified
- Pres. To Gov. 7/1/2022
On June 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Conf Rept Withdrawn
On June 30, 2022 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 07/01/2022
- Cal Pursuant Rule 44(d)
- Conf Com #2 Reported
On June 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Conf Com #2 Reported
- Placed On Cal For 07/01/2022
On June 30, 2022 in the House:
- Conf Rpt Withdrawn
- Conf Rpt Recon
- Conf Report Failed
On June 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Conf Com Reported
- Placed on Today's Calendar
On June 30, 2022 in the House:
- Added to Calendar
- Conf Com Reported
On June 15, 2022 in the House:
- Conf Com Appointed
On June 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Conf Com Appointed
- Failed Concur In H Com Sub
On June 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Placed On Cal For 06/14/2022
On May 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Special Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On May 26, 2022 in the House:
- Special Message Sent To Senate
On May 25, 2022 in the House:
- Ordered Engrossed
- Amend Adopted A1
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Added to Calendar
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On May 18, 2022 in the House:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref to the Com on Transportation, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On August 18, 2021 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On August 4, 2021 in the House:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref to the Com on Transportation, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On May 10, 2021 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On May 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Sent To House
On May 6, 2021 in the House:
- Regular Message Received From Senate
On May 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On March 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
July 1, 2022: C RPT Adoption
- Yeas: 108
- Absent: 12
July 1, 2022: Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt
- Yeas: 44
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor