+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (12)
+ − Actions (51)
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ch. SL 2015-2
- Signed by Gov. 3/31/2015
- Pres. To Gov. 03/31/2015
- Ratified
- Ordered Enrolled
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Conf Report Adopted 3rd
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conf Report Adopted 3rd
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- Conf Report Adopted 2nd
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conf Report Adopted 2nd
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conf Com Reported
- Conf Held As Material
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Conf Com Reported
- Ruled Material
- Placed On Cal For 03/30/2015
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Conf Com Appointed
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conf Com Appointed
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Failed Concur In H Com Sub
- Placed on Today's Calendar
- Special Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Special Message Sent To Senate
- Ordered Engrossed
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Amend Adopted A3
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Amend Adopted A1
- Amend Failed A2
- Passed 2nd Reading
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 03/04/2015
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav
- Re-ref Com On Appropriations
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Serial Referral To Appropriations Added
- Ref To Com On Finance
- Passed 1st Reading
- Regular Message Received From Senate
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Sent To House
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Engrossed
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Amend Tabled A3
- Amend Failed A1
- Amend Adopted A2
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
- Re-ref Com On Appropriations/Base Budget
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On February 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget
- Withdrawn From Com
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (6)
+ − Statutes Amended (10)
- 105 -
- 105-130.5B -
- 105-153.5 -
- 105-153.6 -
- 105-228.90 -
- 105-449.108 -
- 105-449.80 -
- 126-7.1 -
- 105-449.107 -
- 150B -
+ − Votes (14)
March 31, 2015: Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt Third Reading
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 8
- Absent: 1
March 31, 2015: R3 Ruled Mat'l C RPT Adoption
- Yeas: 79
- Nays: 39
- Absent: 2
March 30, 2015: Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt Second Reading
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 9
- Absent: 1
March 30, 2015: R2 Ruled Mat'l C RPT Adoption
- Yeas: 69
- Nays: 49
- Absent: 2
March 9, 2015: Motion 9 To Concur
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 39
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 5
March 5, 2015: A3 Hamilton Third Reading
- Yeas: 109
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 5
- Absent: 3
March 5, 2015: Third Reading
- Yeas: 72
- Nays: 42
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 4
March 4, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 70
- Nays: 47
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 2
March 4, 2015: A1 Catlin Second Reading
- Yeas: 109
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 2
March 4, 2015: A2 Jones Second Reading
- Yeas: 49
- Nays: 68
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 2
February 12, 2015: Third Reading
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 15
February 11, 2015: Amendment 2
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 16
February 11, 2015: Amendment 3 Motion 1 To Table
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 17
February 11, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 14
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor