+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (29)
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ch. SL 2013-23
- Signed by Gov. 4/9/2013
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Pres. To Gov. 04/05/2013
- Ratified
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered Enrolled
- Concurred In H/Com Sub
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed On Cal For 04/03/2013
- Rec To Concur H Com Sub
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Ordered Engrossed
- Passed 3rd Reading
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Amend Adopted A2
- Amend Adopted A1
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Postponed To 03/27/2013
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 03/26/2013
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Judiciary Subcommittee B
- Passed 1st Reading
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Rec From Senate
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Engrossed
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Amend Adopted A1
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Judiciary II
- Passed 1st Reading
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Statutes Amended (5)
+ − Votes (7)
April 3, 2013: Motion 9 To Concur
- Yeas: 47
- Absent: 3
March 28, 2013: Third Reading
- Yeas: 102
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 6
March 27, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 114
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 1
March 27, 2013: A1 Harrison Second Reading
- Yeas: 113
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 1
March 27, 2013: A2 Faircloth Second Reading
- Yeas: 117
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 1
March 5, 2013: Amendment 1
- Yeas: 50
March 5, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 50