+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (30)
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ch. SL 2015-75
On June 11, 2015 in the House:
- Veto Overridden
On June 2, 2015 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 06/03/2015
- Veto Received From Senate
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Veto Overridden
- Placed on Today's Calendar
On May 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Vetoed 05/28/2015
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Pres. To Gov. 05/28/2015
- Ratified
On May 28, 2015 in the House:
- Ordered Enrolled
- Passed 3rd Reading
On May 27, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Added to Calendar
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Judiciary I
- Passed 1st Reading
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- Regular Message Received From Senate
On February 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Sent To House
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Judiciary II
- Withdrawn From Com
On February 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Judiciary I
- Withdrawn From Com
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
On January 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (8)
+ − Votes (7)
June 11, 2015: M4 Previous Question Veto Override
- Yeas: 68
- Nays: 42
- Absent: 10
June 11, 2015: Veto Override
- Yeas: 69
- Nays: 41
- Absent: 10
June 1, 2015: Motion 11 Veto Override
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 16
- Absent: 2
May 28, 2015: Third Reading
- Yeas: 67
- Nays: 43
- Absent: 10
May 27, 2015: Motion 12 - Add bill to Calendar
- Yeas: 65
- Nays: 43
- Present/NV: 5
- Absent: 7
May 27, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 65
- Nays: 45
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 8
February 25, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 16
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor