+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (26)
On June 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ratified
- Ch. SL 2021-41
On June 15, 2021 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Added to Calendar
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Ordered Enrolled
On June 8, 2021 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On June 2, 2021 in the House:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref to the Com on Local Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Passed 1st Reading
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Sent To House
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- Regular Message Received From Senate
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
On March 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor