+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (35)
On June 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ch. SL 2016-86
- Signed by Gov. 6/30/2016
On June 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Pres. To Gov. 06/27/2016
- Ratified
On June 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered Enrolled
- Concurred In H/Com Sub
On June 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav To Concur
On June 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Judiciary I
- Withdrawn From Cal
On June 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed On Cal For 06/22/2016
- Special Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub
On June 20, 2016 in the House:
- Special Message Sent To Senate
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On June 16, 2016 in the House:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref Com On Finance
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 06/20/2016
On June 14, 2016 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Withdrawn From Com
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Finance
- Passed 1st Reading
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Regular Message Received From Senate
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Sent To House
On March 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed On Cal For 03/02/2015
- Passed 2nd Reading
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Finance
- Withdrawn From Com
On February 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (30)
- 105 -
- 153A -
- 160A -
- 105-113.35 -
- 105-129.16A -
- 105-134.1 -
- 105-134.6A -
- 105-153.3 -
- 105-153.4 -
- 105-153.5 -
- 105-153.6 -
- 105-163.15 -
- 105-163.8 -
- 105-164.11 -
- 105-164.13 -
- 105-164.13B -
- 105-164.13E -
- 105-164.16A -
- 105-164.29 -
- 105-164.3 -
- 105-164.4G -
- 105-187.52 -
- 105-241.6 -
- 105-338 -
- 105-339 -
- 153A-146 -
- 160A-206 -
- 62-130. -
- 161-10 -
- 161 -
+ − Votes (4)
June 24, 2016: Motion 9 To Concur
- Yeas: 39
- Absent: 11
June 20, 2016: Second Reading
- Yeas: 101
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 15
March 2, 2015: Third Reading
- Yeas: 49
- Absent: 1
February 25, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 47
- Absent: 3