+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (30)
On June 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Gov. 6/30/2017
- Ch. SL 2017-88
On June 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ratified
- Pres. To Gov. 6/26/2017
On June 22, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Ordered Enrolled
On June 21, 2017 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 06/22/2017
On June 13, 2017 in the House:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref Com On Education - K-12
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- Regular Message Received From Senate
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Sent To House
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
- Re-ref Com On Appropriations/Base Budget
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget. If fav, re-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (2)
June 22, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 111
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 8
March 22, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 49
- Absent: 1