+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (33)
On July 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Gov. 7/12/2017
- Ch. SL 2017-111
On June 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ratified
- Pres. To Gov. 6/27/2017
On June 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Concurred In H/Com Sub
- Ordered Enrolled
On June 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub
- Placed On Cal For 06/26/2017
On June 22, 2017 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On June 21, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On June 20, 2017 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 06/21/2017
On June 8, 2017 in the House:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref Com On Transportation
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Sent To House
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Regular Message Received From Senate
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
- Placed On Cal For 04/24/2017
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On April 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
- Re-ref Com On Health Care
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref to Transportation. If fav, re-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (3)
June 26, 2017: Motion 9 To Concur
- Yeas: 47
- Absent: 3
June 21, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 104
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 4
- Absent: 6
April 24, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 48
- Absent: 2