+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (10)
+ − Actions (34)
On June 26, 2020 in the House:
- Conf Com Appointed
On June 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Special Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub
- Conf Com Appointed
- Failed Concur In H Com Sub
On June 25, 2020 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Sub 2
On June 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Today's Calendar
On June 25, 2020 in the House:
- Special Message Sent To Senate
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Added to Calendar
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
On June 24, 2020 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref to the Com on Judiciary, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Sent To House
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Regular Message Received From Senate
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Placed On Cal For 03/26/2019
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Placed On Cal For 03/25/2019
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
June 25, 2020: Second Reading
- Yeas: 114
- Absent: 6
June 25, 2020: Motion 9 To Concur
- Yeas: 1
- Nays: 45
- Absent: 4