+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On July 22, 2019 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Re-ref Com On Alcoholic Beverage Control
On July 10, 2019 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On June 27, 2019 in the House:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref to the Com on Elections and Ethics Law, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On June 24, 2019 in the House:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref to the Com on State and Local Government, if favorable, Elections and Ethics Law, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Sent To House
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Regular Message Received From Senate
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Placed On Cal For 04/04/2019
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
- Placed On Cal For 04/02/2019
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Vote
April 4, 2019: Second Reading
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor