+ − Summaries (11)
+ − Full Texts (17)
+ − Actions (43)
On June 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Ch. SL 2020-49
- Signed by Gov. 6/29/2020
On June 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Pres. To Gov. 6/26/2020
- Ratified
- Ordered Enrolled
- Conf Report Adopted
- Placed on Today's Calendar
On June 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Conf Com Reported
On June 25, 2020 in the House:
- Conf Report Adopted
- Added to Calendar
- Conf Com Reported
On June 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Conf Com Appointed
- Failed Concur In H Com Sub
- Placed on Today's Calendar
- Special Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub
On June 25, 2020 in the House:
- Conf Com Appointed
On June 24, 2020 in the House:
- Special Message Sent To Senate
- Ordered Engrossed
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Amend Adopted A1
On June 23, 2020 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 06/24/2020
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On June 25, 2019 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Reptd Fav
On June 6, 2019 in the House:
- Re-ref to the Com on Transportation, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Withdrawn From Com
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Ref to the Com on Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House, if favorable, Transportation, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Passed 1st Reading
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Special Message Sent To House
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Special Message Received From Senate
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed On Cal For 03/12/2019
- Reptd Fav
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Reptd Fav
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-ref to Transportation. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Withdrawn From Com
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
June 26, 2020: Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt
- Yeas: 43
- Absent: 7
June 25, 2020: C RPT Adoption
- Yeas: 109
- Absent: 11